CT HB05540 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 591
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 591
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ban guns without serial numbers and regulate those which are sold in a form requiring the purchaser to finish assembly or that are homemade and to permit local authorities to interview immediate family members as part of a determination of an applicant's suitability.
Title
An Act Concerning Ghost Guns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | File Number 591 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 392 |
2018-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-19 | House | Public Hearing 03/23 |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |