CT HB05540 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To amend the charter of The Civic Association of Short Beach.
Title
An Act Amending The Charters Of The Civic Association Of Short Beach In The Town Of Branford And The Mattabassett District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 239 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 70 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 70 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-07 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-07 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-05 | House | Special Act 14-2 |
2014-04-30 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-04-30 | House | Senate Passed |
2014-04-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 439 |
2014-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-17 | House | House Passed |
2014-04-10 | House | File Number 502 |
2014-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 295 |
2014-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |