CT HB05539 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - File Number 535
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - File Number 535
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit persons to carry firearms in state parks.
Title
An Act Concerning Firearms In State Parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | File Number 535 |
2018-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 361 |
2018-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-19 | House | Public Hearing 03/23 |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |