CT HB05539 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - File Number 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - File Number 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish and fund a housing revitalization pilot program in order to provide loans for home repairs to homeowners in distressed municipalities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Revitalization Of Housing In Distressed Municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | File Number 501 |
2014-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 294 |
2014-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |