CT HB05528 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical changes to statutes concerning the administration of government, including reporting provisions.
Title
An Act Decreasing The Membership Of The Commission On Women, Children And Seniors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 374 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 144 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 144 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-24 | House | Public Act 18-133 |
2018-05-09 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-03 | House | File Number 677 |
2018-05-03 | House | Senate Calendar Number 502 |
2018-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4280 |
2018-04-11 | House | File Number 417 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 266 |
2018-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |