CT HB05525 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require a screening test for cytomegalovirus for newborns who fail a newborn hearing screening.
Title
An Act Concerning Cytomegalovirus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 178 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 54 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 54 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-20 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-05-20 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-05-19 | House | Public Act 15-10 |
2015-05-14 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-05-14 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-14 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-08 | House | File Number 786 |
2015-05-08 | House | Senate Calendar Number 478 |
2015-05-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-06 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-06 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6817 |
2015-04-08 | House | File Number 512 |
2015-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 318 |
2015-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-17 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2015-01-30 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |