CT HB05521 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - File Number 453
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - File Number 453
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To subject participants and prospective participants in the first five plus program to the same prohibitions as state contractors and prospective state contractors with regard to political contributions.
Title
An Act Concerning The First Five Plus Program And Political Contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | File Number 453 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 325 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |