CT HB05514 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - File Number 564
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - File Number 564
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide an additional tax reduction for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, for homeowners who qualify for the property tax relief program under section 12-170aa of the general statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning An Additional Tax Reduction For Eligible Homeowners Under The Circuit Breaker Property Tax Relief Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | File Number 564 |
2024-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 384 |
2024-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-03 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-28 | House | Public Hearing 04/01 |
2024-03-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |