CT HB05514 | 2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To provide for the automatic voter registration of any person not already registered during certain transactions or contact with the Department of Motor Vehicles or other state agencies designated by the Secretary of the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Department Of Motor Vehicles And Automatic Voter Registration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-19HouseReferred by House to Committee on Transportation
2016-04-11HouseFile Number 569
2016-04-11HouseHouse Calendar Number 352
2016-04-11HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2016-04-11HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-04-04HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 10:00 AM
2016-03-23HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-21HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2016-03-03HousePublic Hearing 03/07
2016-03-02HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback