CT HB05513 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - File Number 546
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - File Number 546
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) specify that payees of certain payments and distributions may request that an amount be deducted and withheld from such payments and distributions, and (2) provide that if a lump sum payee does not make such request, the amount to be withheld shall be at the highest marginal rate.
Title
An Act Concerning The Deduction And Withholding Of Personal Income Tax From Certain Payments And Distributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | File Number 546 |
2024-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 372 |
2024-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/28 |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |