CT HB05511 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-30 - Senate Calendar Number 573
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-30 - Senate Calendar Number 573
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) increase disclosure with respect to independent expenditures, (2) clarify distinctions between coordinated and independent spending, enhancing enforcement of campaign finance laws, and (3) conform statutes to rulings by the United States Supreme Court and the Second Circuit Court of Appeals.
Title
An Act Concerning Disclosure Of Coordinated And Independent Spending In Campaign Finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 210 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 573 |
2016-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-30 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-04-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5730 |
2016-04-11 | House | File Number 568 |
2016-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 351 |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |