CT HB05508 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - File Number 667
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - File Number 667
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide funding from the drug assets forfeiture revolving account for drug treatment beds.
Title
An Act Providing Funding From The Drug Assets Forfeiture Revolving Account For Inpatient Drug Treatment Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | File Number 667 |
2016-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 421 |
2016-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/16 5:00 PM |
2016-04-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |