CT HB05505 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 671
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require all state agency forms and applications to be updated with a nonbinary gender option.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Updating Of State Forms And Applications To Include A Nonbinary Gender Option.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseFile Number 671
2019-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 407
2019-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/13
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-03-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-15HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback