CT HB05495 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - File Number 324
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To make the foreclosure mediation program permanent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Removing The Sunset Date For The Foreclosure Mediation Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseFile Number 324
2018-04-09HouseHouse Calendar Number 220
2018-04-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-02HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM
2018-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-20HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-13HousePublic Hearing 03/15
2018-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Banking

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback