CT HB05494 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - File Number 463
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - File Number 463
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To exempt certain contact information created by a member of the General Assembly for official purposes from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act and to prohibit its use for campaign purposes.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Disclosure Of Certain Contact Information Under The Freedom Of Information Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | File Number 463 |
2022-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 343 |
2022-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-21 | House | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |