CT HB05494 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - File Number 594
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - File Number 594
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand the exemption from the sales and use tax on services rendered between parent companies and wholly owned subsidiaries to include services rendered between parent companies and subsidiaries that are certain stock corporations, partnerships and limited liability companies where the controlling interest in such subsidiary is more than fifty per cent.
Title
An Act Concerning The Sales Tax On Services Rendered Between Certain Parent Companies And Subsidiaries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | File Number 594 |
2016-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 365 |
2016-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |