CT HB05494 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - File Number 651
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - File Number 651
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To add an additional full-time undergraduate student as an alternate trustee on the Board of Trustees for The University of Connecticut.
Title
An Act Concerning Student Membership On The Board Of Trustees For The University Of Connecticut.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Gregory Haddad [D] | Sen. Mae Flexer [D] | Rep. Bruce Morris [D] |
Rep. Anthony D'Amelio [R] | Rep. Patricia Dillon [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 49 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | House | File Number 651 |
2014-04-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 423 |
2014-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-16 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3546 |
2014-04-03 | House | File Number 354 |
2014-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 216 |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |