CT HB05483 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Senate Calendar Number 526
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Senate Calendar Number 526
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow regional planning organizations to impose a hotel tax as a source of revenue.
Title
An Act Concerning A Regional Hotel Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Senate Calendar Number 526 | |
2010-04-30 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-29 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2010-04-29 | House Passed | |
2010-04-27 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |
2010-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-23 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2010-04-20 | File Number 605 | |
2010-04-20 | House Calendar Number 371 | |
2010-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-13 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-04-05 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-05 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-11 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |