CT HB05482 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To reconstitute the Connecticut Capitol Center Commission in order to create a better partnership between the city of Hartford and the state of Connecticut for the preservation of city treasures in the capitol region.
Title
An Act Reconstituting The Connecticut Capitol Center Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Rep. Marie Kirkley-Bey [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] |
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Matthew Ritter [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 449 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 127 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 127 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2011-06-24 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-20 | Public Act 11-95 | |
2011-06-07 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Passed | |
2011-05-20 | Senate Calendar Number 537 | |
2011-05-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-18 | House Passed | |
2011-05-11 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-11 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-05-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-11 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-04 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-04-07 | File Number 471 | |
2011-04-07 | House Calendar Number 267 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-03-21 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |
2011-01-28 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |