CT HB05475 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To amend statutory provisions concerning a police officer's viewing of a recording from body-worn recording equipment under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Body-worn Recording Equipment Task Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 306 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 244 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-06-01SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-06-01SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-30SenatePublic Act 18-187
2018-05-09SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2018-05-09SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-09SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-07SenateSenate Calendar Number 542
2018-05-07SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-05-07SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2018-05-07HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-07HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5070
2018-04-19HouseFile Number 588
2018-04-19HouseHouse Calendar Number 389
2018-04-19HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-19HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-13HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM
2018-04-04HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-04HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-09HousePublic Hearing 03/14
2018-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback