CT HB05467 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Senate Calendar Number 379
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Senate Calendar Number 379
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure employees and authorized agents of municipal, state or federal agencies involved in evaluating the proposed transfer of a firearm to a person under age twenty-one in this state or any other state have access to records of cases of juvenile matters involving delinquency proceedings.
Title
An Act Concerning Firearms Background Checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 59 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 58 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 60 (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 60 (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 379 |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-25 | House | House Passed |
2024-04-25 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 4370 |
2024-04-16 | House | File Number 516 |
2024-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 354 |
2024-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |