CT HB05467 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 585
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 585
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish parameters for the retention and use of electronic surveillance recordings in certain premises liability matters.
Title
An Act Concerning The Retention Of Electronic Surveillance Recordings In Certain Premises Liability Matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | File Number 585 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 386 |
2018-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |