CT HB05466 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To update certain Department of Revenue Services' procedures, including allowing national background checks for potential new employees, clarifying the applicability of certain estate tax provisions and setting an annual natural gas conversion rate for purposes of the motor vehicle fuels tax.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Revenue Services' Statutes And Procedures, Including Background Checks For Employees, The Master Settlement Agreement, The Motor Vehicle Fuels Tax, The Estate Tax, Additions And Changes To Various Public Lists Maintained By The Department, The Payment Schedule For The Sales And Use Tax, A Data Match System With Financial Institutions, The Personal Income Tax And Technical Corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 431 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 224 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 224 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Public Act 14-155 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-03 | Senate | File Number 758 |
2014-05-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 562 |
2014-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2014-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4784 |
2014-04-22 | House | File Number 660 |
2014-04-22 | House | House Calendar Number 435 |
2014-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/14 10:00 AM |
2014-04-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2014-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |