CT HB05464 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - File Number 468
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - File Number 468
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide towns with grants under the municipal revenue sharing account formula, representing the final quarter of payments in fiscal year 2013.
Title
An Act Concerning Payments Distributed By The Municipal Revenue Sharing Account.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | House | File Number 468 |
2014-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 276 |
2014-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2014-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |