CT HB05454 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - File Number 559
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - File Number 559
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To maximize federal resources for mental health services for young children, their caregivers and pregnant persons.
Title
An Act Concerning Mental Health Services For Young Children, Their Caregivers, Expectant Mothers And Pregnant Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | File Number 559 |
2024-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 379 |
2024-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-22 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-21 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |