CT HB05447 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide for the licensing and inspection of facilities cultivating, processing and supplying aquatic animals in the state for human consumption and to promote scallop production in the Niantic River.
Title
An Act Concerning Aquatic Animals As Food And The Taking Of Scallops From The Niantic River.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Edwin Jutila [D] | Rep. Lawrence Miller [R] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] |
Rep. Joseph Serra [D] | Sen. Andrea Stillman [D] | Rep. Elissa Wright [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 421 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 148 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 148 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-176 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-02 | File Number 615 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Calendar Number 450 | |
2012-05-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-30 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-30 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3872 | |
2012-04-12 | File Number 396 | |
2012-04-12 | House Calendar Number 306 | |
2012-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-09 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |