CT HB05442 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - File Number 406
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - File Number 406
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To limit the amount certain long-term care insurance premium rates may increase in a single year.
Title
An Act Concerning Long-term Care Insurance Policy Premium Rate Increases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | File Number 406 |
2016-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 269 |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |