CT HB05437 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - File Number 866
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - File Number 866
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To amend the Alvin W. Penn Racial Profile Prohibition Act to provide that violation of the act is a discriminatory practice, to provide that each traffic stop, including those that do not result in a citation, results in an electronic record on an electronic device in the police vehicle, to provide that such electronic device print notice and information in English and Spanish to be given to each person stopped concerning how to file a claim under the act, to provide that a copy of such notice and information be provided as part of each motor vehicle operator's license renewal notification and to provide that each municipal police department, the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection and any other department with authority to conduct a traffic stop may be reimbursed for the costs associated with equipping any police officer's vehicle with such an electronic device.
Title
An Act Concerning The Alvin W. Penn Racial Profiling Prohibition Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | House | File Number 866 |
2015-05-20 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-20 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2015-05-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/19/15 5:00 PM |
2015-05-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-14 | House | File Number 622 |
2015-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 392 |
2015-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-12 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |