CT HB05437 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow tenants to submit their forwarding addresses to their landlords by electronic mail and eliminate the requirement that landlords pay tenants a higher interest rate on security deposits than landlords may obtain from depositing such security deposits in a financial institution.
Title
An Act Concerning Security Deposits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 435 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 112 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 112 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-24 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-20 | Public Act 11-94 | |
2011-06-07 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-19 | File Number 813 | |
2011-05-19 | Senate Calendar Number 519 | |
2011-05-19 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-17 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-17 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5629 | |
2011-03-23 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-23 | No New File by Committee on Housing | |
2011-03-22 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-22 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-16 | Referred by House to Committee on Housing | |
2011-03-01 | File Number 19 | |
2011-03-01 | House Calendar Number 31 | |
2011-03-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/28/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-02-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-01-21 | Public Hearing 01/25 | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |