CT HB05435 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-16 - File Number 446
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-16 - File Number 446
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify procedures concerning "do not resuscitate" orders.
Title
An Act Concerning "do Not Resuscitate" Orders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | File Number 446 | |
2012-04-16 | House Calendar Number 343 | |
2012-04-16 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-09 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-30 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-29 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-12 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |