CT HB05435 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 86-14-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 86-14-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Majority Leaders' Job Growth Roundtable.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Majority Leaders' Job Growth Roundtable.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 260 PASS (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-12 | Public Act 10-75 | |
2010-05-06 | Signed by Governor in Original | |
2010-05-01 | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor | |
2010-05-01 | In Concurrence | |
2010-05-01 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2010-05-01 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2010-05-01 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-05-01 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2010-05-01 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2010-05-01 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4895 | |
2010-05-01 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4884 | |
2010-04-27 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-21 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-04-20 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-20 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-13 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-08 | File Number 415 | |
2010-04-08 | House Calendar Number 213 | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-05 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |