CT HB05430 | 2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To combat the opioid epidemic in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Opioids.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 349 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 60 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 53 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 61 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 62 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2022-05-17HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2022-05-17HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2022-05-13HousePublic Act 22-108
2022-05-04HouseIn Concurrence
2022-05-04HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
2022-05-04HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B
2022-04-21HouseFile Number 582
2022-04-21HouseSenate Calendar Number 414
2022-04-21HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2022-04-19HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
2022-04-19HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4922
2022-04-19HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 4860
2022-04-12HouseFile Number 416
2022-04-12HouseHouse Calendar Number 295
2022-04-12HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2022-04-12HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2022-04-05HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 5:00 PM
2022-03-28HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2022-03-25HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2022-03-10HousePublic Hearing 03/14
2022-03-09HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB05430&which_year=2022
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/TOB/H/PDF/2022HB-05430-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/TOB/H/PDF/2022HB-05430-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/ACT/PA/PDF/2022PA-00108-R00HB-05430-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/lcoamd/pdf/2022LCO04922-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/lcoamd/pdf/2022LCO04909-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/lcoamd/pdf/2022LCO04860-R00-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/FN/PDF/2022HB-05430-R000416-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/BA/PDF/2022HB-05430-R000416-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/fna/pdf/2022HB-05430-R00LCO04860-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/fna/pdf/2022HB-05430-R00LCO04909-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/fna/pdf/2022HB-05430-R00LCO04922-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/FN/PDF/2022HB-05430-R01-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/BA/PDF/2022HB-05430-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/FN/PDF/2022HB-05430-R010582-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/BA/PDF/2022HB-05430-R010582-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/SUM/PDF/2022SUM00108-R02HB-05430-SUM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/TS/H/PDF/2022HB-05430-R00PH-CV108-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/VOTE/H/PDF/2022HV-00062-R00HB05430-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/VOTE/H/PDF/2022HV-00061-R00HB05430-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/VOTE/H/PDF/2022HV-00060-R00HB05430-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2022/VOTE/S/PDF/2022SV-00349-R00HB05430-SV.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback