CT HB05430 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow private parties to sell alcoholic liquor to permit holders for auction.
Title
An Act Permitting The Sale Of Privately Held Alcoholic Liquor For Auction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 305 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 309 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 26 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 309 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 26 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-16 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-16 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-10 | House | Public Act 16-56 |
2016-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Passed |
2016-04-14 | House | Senate Calendar Number 383 |
2016-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | House Passed |
2016-03-24 | House | File Number 193 |
2016-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 158 |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |