CT HB05428 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) establish a pilot program for the provision of building inspection services on a regional basis, (2) specify that building officials who fail to perform the duties of their office may be dismissed without opportunity for a public hearing, (3) require the Commissioner of Administrative Services to develop and implement a process for the digitization of records relating to the administration of the state building code, (4) require the Commissioner of Administrative Services to study options for reciprocal licensure of building officials from other jurisdictions, and (5) require the Commissioners of Administrative Services and Higher Education to study options to encourage community college students to pursue careers as building officials.
Title
An Act Concerning Records Relating To The Administration Of The State Building Code And The Promotion Of Careers In Related Fields.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 376 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 98 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 98 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Special Act 22-14 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | File Number 669 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 497 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5068 |
2022-04-12 | House | File Number 415 |
2022-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 294 |
2022-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-10 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |