CT HB05424 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To permit a deputy registrar of voters, who is running for the office of registrar of voters, to perform his or her official duties in a polling place at a regular election.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Candidates For The Office Of Registrar Of Voters At Regular Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 375 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 204 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 204 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Public Act 18-120 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 507 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-12 | House | File Number 442 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 313 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |