CT HB05424 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - File Number 666
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - File Number 666
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to establish the Learn Here, Live Here program, which helps students save toward a down payment on their first home in Connecticut by segregating a portion of their state income tax payments for up to ten years after they graduate.
Title
An Act Concerning The Implementation Of The Learn Here, Live Here Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | File Number 666 |
2016-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 420 |
2016-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/16 5:00 PM |
2016-04-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-23 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-03-22 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |