CT HB05416 | 2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - File Number 466
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To establish a Livestock Care Standards Advisory Council to provide policy recommendations to the Commissioner of Agriculture on the care and handling of livestock and to prohibit the use of certain enclosures for gestating sows.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Livestock Care Standards Advisory Council.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-09HouseFile Number 466
2014-04-09HouseHouse Calendar Number 274
2014-04-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2014-04-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
2014-03-24HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-03-21HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2014-03-12HousePublic Hearing 03/17
2014-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback