CT HB05413 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-19 - File Number 569
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-19 - File Number 569
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) revise provisions regarding forfeiture of certain illegally used vehicles, (2) authorize municipalities to adopt an ordinance related to street takeovers, (3) establish penalties for driving while a person's license is suspended or revoked due to a violation related to a street takeover, and (4) establish a grant program to provide funds to municipalities to enforce laws related to street takeovers and the illegal use of certain vehicles.
Title
An Act Concerning The Illegal Use Of Certain Vehicles And Street Takeovers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 15 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 137 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 16 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 16 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | File Number 569 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 329 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-17 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3875 |
2024-04-11 | House | File Number 453 |
2024-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 297 |
2024-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |