CT HB05411 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the proposals of the Department of Transportation regarding (1) increased participation in the local bridge program, (2) the administration of public transit, (3) work zone safety funds, (4) the right of a holder of an option to purchase to participate in the transit-oriented development project, (5) the commissioner's authority to enforce parking at state commuter parking areas, (6) revisions to statutes related to transportation, and (7) outdated and duplicative reporting mandates.
Title
An Act Concerning Department Of Transportation Recommendations Regarding The Local Bridge Program, The Transit-oriented Development Project, Outdated Reporting Mandates, Scrap Metal Processors, Operation Of A Labor Day Weekend Coffee Stop And Revisions To Other Statutes Related To Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 417 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 421 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 246 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 421 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 246 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-19 | House | Public Act 16-151 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Calendar Number 593 |
2016-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-05-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-05-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6010 |
2016-03-29 | House | File Number 242 |
2016-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 185 |
2016-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |