CT HB05409 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To facilitate the reimbursement to consumers for veterinary bills incurred for the care of sick dogs or cats adopted from pet shops, to clarify certain pet shop penalty statutes and to prohibit pet shops from selling dogs and cats obtained from substandard domestic animal mills.
Title
An Act Concerning The Possession Of Certain Animals And Pet Shops And Consumer Reimbursement For Certain Veterinary Expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 379 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 231 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 231 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-23 | Public Act 12-105 | |
2012-05-08 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-05 | File Number 643 | |
2012-05-05 | Senate Calendar Number 503 | |
2012-05-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-04 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2012-05-04 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-04 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4530 | |
2012-04-12 | File Number 392 | |
2012-04-12 | House Calendar Number 302 | |
2012-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-09 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |