CT HB05403 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require state courts to extend full faith and credit to military protection orders, (2) include under the crime of harassment in the second degree certain conduct engaged in by current or former members of the National Guard, and (3) provide financial assistance to certain victims of sexual assault or sexual harassment for certain costs associated with participating in administrative or court-martial proceedings.
Title
An Act Concerning Military Protection Orders And Other Interpersonal Violence Protections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-18 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' and Military Affairs |