CT HB05385 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - File Number 318
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - File Number 318
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a working group to study health insurance premium rate increases in this state and develop recommendations to mitigate such increases.
Title
An Act Establishing A Working Group To Study Health Insurance Premium Rate Increases And Develop Recommendations To Mitigate Such Increases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | File Number 318 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 213 |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |