CT HB05384 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - File Number 730
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - File Number 730
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To raise the legal age for the purchase and use of tobacco products.
Title
An Act Raising The Legal Age For Purchase And Use Of Tobacco Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | File Number 730 |
2017-05-09 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-09 | House | New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/17 5:00 PM |
2017-04-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-03-22 | House | File Number 112 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 107 |
2017-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-06 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2017-02-28 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-03 | House | Public Hearing 02/10 |
2017-01-25 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |