CT HB05381 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify under which circumstances an officer shall not pause body-worn recording equipment.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Police Body-worn Recording Equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 211 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 49 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 49 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-09 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-09 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-08 | House | Public Act 24-15 |
2024-05-06 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 363 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-23 | House | House Passed |
2024-04-16 | House | File Number 513 |
2024-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 351 |
2024-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |