CT HB05366 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - File Number 81
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - File Number 81
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the bow hunting of deer on private property on Sundays throughout the state rather than only in deer management zones.
Title
An Act Authorizing Sunday Bow Hunting Of Deer On Private Property Throughout The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | File Number 81 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 95 |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |