CT HB05366 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To: (1) Conform internal statutory references to the appropriate governing federal act; (2) amend sections 46b-15 and 46b-16a of the general statutes to permit minors to apply for certain orders of protection; (3) exclude cap plea agreements from review by the Sentence Review Division; (4) specify that a party to a deposition or the deponent may obtain a copy of the deposition transcript and permanent electronic record of such deposition as his or her own expense; (5) delete the requirement that a two dollar fee be paid to a court clerk for receiving and filing an assessment of damages by appraisers of land taken for public use; and (6) amend the 2013 bond act to allow the Judicial Branch to purchase the Waterford Juvenile Facility.
Title
An Act Concerning Court Operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 385 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 389 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 80 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 389 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 80 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-16 | House | Public Act 16-105 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-22 | House | File Number 708 |
2016-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 478 |
2016-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4089 |
2016-03-31 | House | File Number 345 |
2016-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 239 |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |