CT HB05366 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - File Number 540
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - File Number 540
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To protect crime victims, and individuals against whom multiple civil actions have been filed and dismissed, by establishing standards for plaintiffs who initiate civil actions against such victims and individuals, and to make standards concerning subpoenas in civil actions against crime victims applicable to all plaintiffs, rather than limiting such provisions to pro se litigants as currently provided.
Title
An Act Concerning Civil Actions And Subpoenas Filed To Harass An Individual Or After Numerous Actions Against The Individual Have Been Dismissed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | File Number 540 | |
2012-04-19 | House Calendar Number 395 | |
2012-04-19 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-13 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-04-02 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-02 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-08 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |