CT HB05364 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To streamline the filing of municipal workers' compensation claims.
Title
An Act Concerning The Filing Of Workers' Compensation Claims When A Municipality Is The Employer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 419 CONSENT CALENDAR 3 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 383 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 423 CONSENT CALENDAR 3 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 387 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 43 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 383 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 423 CONSENT CALENDAR 3 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 387 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 43 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-16 | House | Public Act 16-112 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2016-04-15 | House | Senate Calendar Number 418 |
2016-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | House Passed |
2016-03-24 | House | File Number 188 |
2016-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 153 |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |