CT HB05360 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) require that at least ten years of the Adjutant General's fifteen years of commissioned service in the armed forces be served in the National Guard, and (2) make technical and clarifying changes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Adjutant General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 399 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 403 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 50 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 403 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 50 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-16 | House | Public Act 16-111 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2016-04-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 454 |
2016-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-19 | House | House Passed |
2016-03-22 | House | File Number 116 |
2016-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 110 |
2016-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |