CT HB05359 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish the Public-Private Partnership Commission to make recommendations to the Governor concerning agency requests for projects to be made into public-private partnerships.
Title
An Act Conveying A Parcel Of Land To The Catherine Violet Hubbard Foundation, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 361 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 243 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 243 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-16 | House | Special Act 14-13 |
2014-05-06 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-06 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-06 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Calendar Number 575 |
2014-05-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-05 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-05 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5040 |
2014-04-01 | House | File Number 247 |
2014-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 154 |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |